Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 6718 Week
» 38507 Month
» 187272 Year
» 1408837 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3819 m/e 12/1936
LNER (1946) 1979 m/e 09/1946
BR 61979 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1936
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1936
Withdrawal Mon 16/10/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1936
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948
35A New England 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 16/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   16/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 3819
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1979    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61979    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
16/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61979    

prev prev