|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3821 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1690 |
||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1981 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61981 | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
18/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
19/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
24/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61981 | ||
1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |