Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2470 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15876 Week
» 68892 Month
» 188419 Year
» 3215272 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3824 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1984 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61984 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1693 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/11/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1936 |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52D |
|
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
56B |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
3w/e |
30/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3824 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1693 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1984 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61984 |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
02/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61984 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|