Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3827 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1987 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61987 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1697 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/03/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3827 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1697 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1987 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61987 |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61987 |
|
|