Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 885 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14291 Week
» 67307 Month
» 186834 Year
» 3213687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3829 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1989 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61989 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1699 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/06/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3829 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1699 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1989 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61989 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61989 |
|
|