Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 766 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 32240 Month
» 66882 Year
» 1288447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER 3442 m/e 07/1938
LNER (1946) 1994 m/e 09/1946
BR 61994 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1938 MACCAILEIN MÓR (removed 07/1938)
08/1938 THE GREAT MARQUESS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K4
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal Mon 18/12/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn 18/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   18/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1938 Naming Renamed 'THE GREAT MARQUESS'    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1994    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61994    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
18/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61994    

prev prev