|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
27/12/1958 | Yarmouth (South Town) MPD | 32D has acquired 4 Britannia diagrams and Lowestoft has acquired a B17 diagram (but this may be altered to a K3); on the other hand Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) is now completely diesel as is Cromer Beach, whilst Felixtowe's 4 sets of men now work diesel cars-the last steam locomotive here being L1 67710. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number E9009 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2028 |
||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67710 | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
23/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
15/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
23/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
05/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
24/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67710 |