Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways (1st) |
E9010 |
on |
19/03/1948 |
British Railways |
67711 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2029 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Sun 19/03/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Bishops Stortford |
No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number E9010 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2029 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67711 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67711 |
|
|