Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 55 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6589 Week
» 6589 Month
» 195724 Year
» 1417289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67718   07/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2036
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 07/05/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/11/1961
Service Life 13 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 07/05/1948
NEA Neasden m/e 30/11/1949
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/03/1953
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 16/05/1953
34D Hitchin (GNR) 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/03/1955
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
34E New England w/e 03/12/1960
9G Gorton w/e 07/01/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NEA Neasden 07/05/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 06/08/1949
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 04/02/1961
TOSTORE 34E New England 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   w/e 18/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1954 York MPD During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. SLS/195406
29/01/1961 New England 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. SLS/196103


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/05/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 67718
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2036
   
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
18/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67718    

prev prev