Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 191 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 191 Week
» 18973 Month
» 267266 Year
» 1151647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67720   14/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2038
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 14/05/1948
Withdrawal Mon 12/02/1962
Service Life 13 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32B Ipswich 5w/e 21/03/1953
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 16/05/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/03/1955
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 12/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NEA Neasden 14/05/1948
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   12/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/05/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 67720
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2038
   
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67720    

prev prev