Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3117 Week
» 14688 Month
» 262981 Year
» 1147362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67721   25/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2039
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 25/05/1948
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962
Service Life 14 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
34E New England w/e 03/12/1960
9G Gorton w/e 07/01/1961
56F Low Moor w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 25/05/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 04/02/1961
TOSTORE 34E New England 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/05/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 67721
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2039
   
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67721    

prev prev