Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67722   04/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2040
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 04/06/1948
Withdrawal Thu 05/10/1961
Service Life 13 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 05/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 04/06/1948
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   05/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 67722
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2040
   
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/02/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.   Link
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67722    
11/11/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Scrapyard. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev