Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67723   04/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2041
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sun 04/06/1948
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden m/e 30/11/1949
31A Cambridge w/e 28/02/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 10/06/1948
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 67723
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2041
   
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67723    

prev prev