|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1961 | New England (In store) | 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. | SLS/196103 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, i Complete Locos) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 67732 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26571 |
||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
17/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67732 |