Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67733   01/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L981
Works Number 26572
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 01/11/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 13 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 27/06/1959
34A Kings Cross w/e 16/01/1960
9G Gorton w/e 07/01/1961
2F Woodford Halse w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW EFD Eastfield 01/11/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 31/03/1962
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/11/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 67733
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26572
   
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67733    

prev prev