Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67751 |
on |
10/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L981 |
Works Number |
26590 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Thu 10/12/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 29/03/1962 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'L.1' 2-6-4T's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 67748 (6/12), 67749 (7/12), 67750 (9/12), 67751 (10/12), 67752 (14/12), 67753 (15/12), 67754 (17/12), 67755 (21/12), 67756 (22/12), 67757 (24/12), 67758 (27/12), 67759 (29/12), 67760 (30/12), 67761 (11/1), 67762 (14/1), 67763(21/1) and 67764 (3/2). Further Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 67757-762 (26596-601/48). |
SLS/194903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67751 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26590 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/06/1957 |
Report |
Report: On June 19 "L1" 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 67751/81/98 were at work into and out of London Road, Manchester. Together with the newly introduced multiple-unit diesel services, they appeared to have ousted Gorton’s "C14" and "A5" tanks from local passenger jobs. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
29/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67751 |
|
|