28/02/1949 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'L.1' 2-6-4T's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 67748 (6/12), 67749 (7/12), 67750 (9/12), 67751 (10/12), 67752 (14/12), 67753 (15/12), 67754 (17/12), 67755 (21/12), 67756 (22/12), 67757 (24/12), 67758 (27/12), 67759 (29/12), 67760 (30/12), 67761 (11/1), 67762 (14/1), 67763(21/1) and 67764 (3/2). Further Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 67757-762 (26596-601/48). |
SLS/194903 |
22/02/1957 |
Whitby-Redcar workmen\'s trains |
From the beginning of petrol rationing until 22nd February, special trains were run every morning to take workmen from Whitby to Redcar special platform for Wilton. These men were mainly employed by contractors on the Imperial Chemical Industries' site at Wilton. These trains loaded to seven coaches, and Whitby was allocated two Class Ll engines to work them, Nos. 67763/5. On the final timings the train left Whitby town at 6-15 a.m., called at West Cliff and Sandsend, running non-stop from there to Redcar, arriving at 7-30 a.m. The locomotive and crew ran back light to Crag Hall and then worked the pick-up goods through to Whitby. The second crew worked the afternoon goods back to Crag Hall and then brought the return workmen's train from Redcar, leaving at 4-50 p.m. and reaching Whitby at 6-17 p.m. A second special train, consisting of a three-coach push-pull set, hauled by a G5, ran out from Middlesbrough as far as Hinderwell in the morning and preceded the Whitby train. It is a great pity that these interesting workings did not continue on a regular basis, but it must be admitted that the timings over the difficult coast line, and the change from road to rail at Redcar, gave he railway little advantage in time compared with a through journey by road. |
SLS/195708 |
31/12/1961 |
Ardsley district |
Lls 67742/55/63/5/77 have been transferred to Ardsley for freight workings; 67754/9/64 have been transferred to Low Moor in exchange for LM 2-6-4Ts, transferred to Darlington. Two Low Moor Royal Scots (46117/45) are on loan to Mirfield and 46117 was observed on Saltley on 26th November with 56D chalked on smoke-box door. |
SLS/196201 |
10/03/1963 |
Ardsley MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Washingborough Junction (Stored) |
The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. |
SLS/196304 |