Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1251 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14657 Week
» 67673 Month
» 187200 Year
» 3214053 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67782 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7516 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 03/1950 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/11/1961 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
on |
10/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67782 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7516 |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67782 |
|
|