Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1090 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14496 Week
» 67512 Month
» 187039 Year
» 3213892 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67784 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7518 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 03/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/11/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
on |
31/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67784 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7518 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
08/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67784 |
|
|