Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 67796 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class L1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E177
Works Number 7530
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1950
Withdrawal Tue 06/11/1962
Service Life 12 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
34E Neasden 4w/e 20/09/1952
38A Colwick 5w/e 23/04/1955
34A Kings Cross 5w/e 23/04/1955
34E Neasden 5w/e 24/03/1956
9G Gorton w/e 01/11/1958
34E New England w/e 07/01/1961
34F Grantham w/e 11/11/1961
   Withdrawn 06/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34A Kings Cross 16/08/1950
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 34E Neasden 5w/e 31/03/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
LOAN 9G Gorton 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   06/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 67796
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7530
   
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
06/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67796    

prev prev