Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Metropolitan Railway |
113 |
on |
23/03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6160 |
|
06/04/1939 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9071 |
|
05/01/1947 |
British Railways |
69071 |
|
Not applied |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
NEA |
Neasden |
on |
06/10/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
23/03/1925 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number LT30) |
07/04/1943 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number 1435) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Metropolitan Railway Number 113 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 704 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 12 boiler fitted |
|
|
1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: ?/02/1937. |
|
|
1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 06/04/1939. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6160
|
|
|
1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: ?/01/1942. |
|
|
07/01/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1433 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/01/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number LT11 boiler fitted |
|
|
1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: ?/04/1943. |
|
|
07/04/1943 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1435 boiler fitted |
|
|
14/07/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1430 (Diagram 12)
|
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9071 |
|
|
15/03/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. |
|
|
29/08/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/08/1948. |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9071 from Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 69071 but not taken up |
|
|