Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15469 Week
» 68485 Month
» 188012 Year
» 3214865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Metropolitan Railway |
115 |
on |
28/03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6162 |
|
26/07/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9072 |
|
Not applied |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/09/1941 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number 1429) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Neasden |
|
1936 |
10/1936 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1938 |
26/07/1938 |
|
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6162
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1941 |
09/1941 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1943 |
08/1943 |
|
General |
Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 12)
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Metropolitan Railway Number 115 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 706 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 12 boiler fitted |
|
|
1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: ?/10/1936. |
|
|
1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 26/07/1938. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6162
|
|
|
1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: ?/09/1941. |
|
|
07/09/1941 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1429 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/09/1941 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number LT33 boiler fitted |
|
|
1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: ?/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 12)
|
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 9072 but not taken up |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6162 from Neasden (NEA) |
|
|