Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1811 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19614 Week
» 72630 Month
» 192157 Year
» 3219010 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Metropolitan Railway |
116 |
on |
28/03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6163 |
|
04/11/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9073 |
|
Not applied |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/03/1942 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number 1432) |
07/10/1943 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number 1429) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Neasden |
|
1935 |
10/1935 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1938 |
04/11/1938 |
|
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6163
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1942 |
03/1942 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1943 |
10/1943 |
|
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Metropolitan Railway Number 116 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 707 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 12 boiler fitted |
|
|
1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/10/1935. |
|
|
1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 04/11/1938. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6163
|
|
|
1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: ?/03/1942. |
|
|
07/03/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1432 boiler fitted |
|
|
1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: ?/10/1943. |
|
|
07/10/1943 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1429 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/10/1943 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number LT33 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/05/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6163 from Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 9073 but not taken up |
|
|