Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7451 Week
» 36949 Month
» 373795 Year
» 1595360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 272 m/e 12/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5272   17/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9050   18/08/1946
British Railways 69050   01/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L312/1914
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1914 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Sat 12/03/1955 off Woodford Halse (38E)
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys
Information This engine spent 4 years at Retford from 1929-1933, mainly to work as a Worksop shunter. It was nicknamed 'The Zeppelin' by the railwaymen there.

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/3/55

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 12/1914
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 02/10/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 06/10/1929
MEX Mexborough on 09/03/1933
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/11/1942
MEX Mexborough on 20/02/1944
NEA Neasden on 21/07/1946
MEX Mexborough on 30/04/1947
WFD Woodford Halse on 17/08/1947
   Withdrawn on 12/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 30/04/1947
WDN BGT Bathgate on 05/08/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 17/08/1947
WDN   on 12/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1914 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 668)
17/01/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 683)
06/02/1932 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 682)
04/11/1933 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 645)
06/02/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3103)
27/07/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 60)
21/08/1943 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 759)
26/04/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3128)
01/04/1950 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 649)
20/12/1952 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 22025)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/01/1917 10/03/1917 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/08/1920 30/10/1920 85 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 30/06/1923 106 days General  
Gorton Works 22/11/1924 17/01/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5272
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 30/06/1927 62 days General  
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 31/08/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 16/01/1932 06/02/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 682 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 04/11/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1937 06/02/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 27/07/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1943 21/08/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 759 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 26/04/1947 50 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1950 01/04/1950 22 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69050
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1952 20/12/1952 29 days General
After collision
Boiler number 22025 (Diagram 14)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 272
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1917. Dep: 10/03/1917.    
07/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1920. Dep: 30/10/1920.    
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.    
22/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5272
   
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 30/06/1927.    
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.    
02/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
16/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 682 (Diagram 14)
   
09/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
   
09/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 759 (Diagram 14)
   
20/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9050    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 14)
   
30/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
11/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69050
   
22/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 22025 (Diagram 14)
   
12/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69050 from Woodford Halse (38E)    

prev