Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 273 m/e 12/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5273   16/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9051   01/12/1946
British Railways 69051   06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L312/1914
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1914 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 14/05/1951 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 26/5/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 12/1914
ANN Annesley on 08/11/1919
IMM Immingham on 10/03/1923
KEA Keadby on 24/06/1929
IMM Immingham on 30/11/1929
FRO Frodingham on 15/09/1932
MEX Mexborough on 16/11/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 08/09/1946
13D Northwich on 16/02/1947
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 02/04/1947
MEX Mexborough on 07/05/1947
FRO Frodingham on 22/02/1948
   Withdrawn on 14/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 14/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1914 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 670)
16/02/1924 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1890)
23/11/1929 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 340)
09/05/1936 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3101)
13/06/1942 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 724)
17/03/1945 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 645)
06/11/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3123)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/12/1916 17/02/1917 78 days General  
Gorton Works 02/04/1921 07/05/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 16/02/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1890 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5273
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1925 20/02/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1928 14/04/1928 64 days General  
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 23/11/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 07/05/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 11/04/1936 09/05/1936 29 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3101 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 24/06/1939 50 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1942 13/06/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 724 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 17/03/1945 36 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1946 24/08/1946 50 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/10/1947 01/11/1947 15 days Heavy
Secondhand cyls exB8 1356
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1948 06/11/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69051
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 273
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
02/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1916. Dep: 17/02/1917.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1921. Dep: 07/05/1921.    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1890 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5273
   
26/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
11/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.    
24/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 14)
   
30/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932.    
15/09/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3101 (Diagram 14)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939.    
18/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 724 (Diagram 14)
   
16/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
   
06/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9051    
16/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
02/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
07/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand cyls exB8 1356
   
22/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
02/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69051
   
14/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69051 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev