Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 103 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5211 Week
» 34709 Month
» 371555 Year
» 1593120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 274 m/e 02/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5274   17/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9052   20/10/1946
British Railways 69052   26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L302/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1915 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 09/08/1954 off Northwich (9G)
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/8/54

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 02/1915
ANN Annesley on 08/11/1919
IMM Immingham on 10/03/1923
NEA Neasden on 31/01/1925
WFD Woodford Halse on 28/03/1929
MEX Mexborough on 29/06/1929
WFD Woodford Halse on 06/08/1942
13D Northwich on 19/01/1943
GOR Gorton on 09/12/1945
13D Northwich on 12/05/1946
   Withdrawn on 09/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 14/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 673)
10/11/1923 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 492)
06/06/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 334)
08/06/1935 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 988)
03/09/1938 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 590)
10/01/1942 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 687)
22/04/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 649)
20/04/1946 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 683)
26/06/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3105)
26/08/1950 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3134)
09/02/1952 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 22016)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/04/1917 16/06/1917 50 days General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 16/04/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 25/08/1923 10/11/1923 78 days General
Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 17/01/1925 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5274
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 23/06/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 06/06/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 334 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 08/06/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1938 03/09/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1941 10/01/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1944 22/04/1944 41 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 20/04/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 23/08/1947 15 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 05/06/1948 26/06/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69052
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1949 30/07/1949 9 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/08/1950 26/08/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1952 09/02/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22016 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1953 05/09/1953 29 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/12/1952 Northwich MPD It was confirmed, when this shed was visited on the shortest day of the year, that 45 locomotives are housed there. Among these are a dozen '8F's'; eight 'J.10's' and five 'D.10's.' For working the heavily graded Winnington mineral branch, only one L.3 2-6-4 tank remains (69052); it is assisted on similar duties by two recently drafted 'Super-D' 0-8-0's (49405 and 49435). Both the latter have been fitted with tender cabs for backward running. The remaining locomotives at Northwich comprise a number of 'standard class 4' 0-6-0's; one D.11 and one or two other oddments. SLS/195302
12/09/1953 Northwich MPD The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. SLS/195311
24/04/1954 Northwich MPD No major changes were noted at this depot on 24th April. No 69052 has recently been to Gorton for overhaul, and has evidently developed some further defect, since she was suspended from the bunker end under the sheerlegs. It was interesting to discern quite distinctly under the coat of paint on the tender sides of 48046, the letters 'W.D.' with the broad arrow between. Two engines of class D10 were on the shed, 62659 'Worsley Taylor' and 62653 'Sir Edward Fraser,' while 62656 'Sir Clement Royds' was working the 3.40 p.m. Manchester-Chester train. Dll 62669 'Ypres' was still under repair at the back of the shed. SLS/195405

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1915 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 274
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
28/04/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1917. Dep: 16/06/1917.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
25/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14)
   
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5274
   
31/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
05/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928.    
28/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 334 (Diagram 14)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14)
   
30/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14)
   
02/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
   
06/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
13/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
   
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9052    
09/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947.    
05/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69052
   
22/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.    
05/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 14)
   
12/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22016 (Diagram 14)
   
08/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953.    
09/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69052 from Northwich (9G)    

prev prev