Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 275 m/e 03/1915
LNER (1924) 5275   07/03/1925
LNER (1946) 9053   18/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E9053   17/01/1948
BR 69053   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L303/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1915 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 17/07/1950 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 35 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys
Information Carried an E prefix prior to BR renumbering

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 22/7/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 03/1915
MEX Mexborough 27/04/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 05/08/1942
NEA Neasden 31/01/1943
   Withdrawn 17/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 682)
23/01/1932 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
28/04/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 977)
13/03/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1675)
27/04/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3107)
12/02/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 707)
17/01/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3104)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/01/1917 17/02/1917 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/04/1920 03/07/1920 71 days General  
Gorton Works 16/12/1922 27/01/1923 43 days General  
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 07/03/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5275
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 07/01/1928 64 days General  
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 07/12/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/12/1931 23/01/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1934 28/04/1934 36 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 13/03/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1940 27/04/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 03/05/1941 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/01/1944 12/02/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 17/01/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 3104 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9053
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1915 To Service To service as GCR Number 275
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
13/01/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1917. Dep: 17/02/1917.    
24/04/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.    
16/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.    
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 07/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5275
   
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928.    
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.    
26/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1931. Dep: 23/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
24/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
   
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
   
23/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 14)
   
27/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.    
05/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
31/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
07/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9053    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3104 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9053
   
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69053 but not taken up    
17/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9053 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev