Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 921 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1846 Week
» 19182 Month
» 296978 Year
» 1181359 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 337 m/e 05/1915
LNER (1924) 5337   03/07/1926
LNER (1946) 9056   24/03/1946
BR (Tmp) E9056   07/02/1948
BR 69056   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L305/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 05/1915 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 22/01/1951 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Information Carried an E prefix prior to BR renumbering

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 05/1915
ANN Annesley 08/11/1919
IMM Immingham 10/03/1923
WFD Woodford Halse 18/02/1943
MEX Mexborough 21/06/1943
NEA Neasden 25/08/1946
   Withdrawn 22/01/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 977)
08/12/1923 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 987)
18/02/1933 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 339)
09/05/1936 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 687)
25/03/1939 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
28/06/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 648)
25/12/1943 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3119)
07/02/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 614)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/12/1916 06/01/1917 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/08/1917 25/08/1917 22 days General  
Gorton Works 05/02/1921 09/04/1921 64 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 08/12/1923 57 days General
Boiler number 987 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1926 03/07/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5337
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1928 13/10/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 20/09/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 18/02/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1936 09/05/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 25/03/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1941 28/06/1941 43 days General
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1943 25/12/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 07/02/1948 39 days General
Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9056
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1950   No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1915 To Service To service as GCR Number 337
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
02/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1916. Dep: 06/01/1917.    
04/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 09/04/1921.    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 987 (Diagram 14)
   
01/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5337
   
25/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 20/09/1930.    
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
   
11/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
17/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
   
18/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14)
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9056    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 07/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9056
   
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69056 but not taken up    
23/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/12/1950.    
22/01/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 9056 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev