|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/12/1916 | 06/01/1917 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1917 | 25/08/1917 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1921 | 09/04/1921 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 08/12/1923 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 987 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1926 | 03/07/1926 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5337 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1928 | 13/10/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 20/09/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1933 | 18/02/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 07/02/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9056 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1950 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 337 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
02/12/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1916. Dep: 06/01/1917. | ||
04/08/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917. | ||
08/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 09/04/1921. | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 987 (Diagram 14) |
||
01/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5337 |
||
25/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 20/09/1930. | ||
14/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14) |
||
11/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
17/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
18/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9056 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9056 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69056 but not taken up | ||
23/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/12/1950. | ||
22/01/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9056 from Neasden (34E) |