Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 464 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 464 Week
» 17800 Month
» 295596 Year
» 1179977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 339 m/e 11/1915
LNER (1924) 5339   27/09/1924
LNER (1946) 9058   05/05/1946
BR 69058   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L311/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1915 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 29/08/1949 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) m/e 11/1915
SHF Sheffield Darnall 20/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 16/02/1947
   Withdrawn 29/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham 16/02/1947
WDN FRO Frodingham 29/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 988)
27/08/1921 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
27/09/1924 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 953)
27/01/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 260)
25/12/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1909)
28/06/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3111)
10/06/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 687)
23/11/1946 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 670)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/07/1918 09/11/1918 120 days General  
Gorton Works 04/06/1921 27/08/1921 85 days General
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1924 27/09/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 953 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5339
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1929 02/11/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 27/01/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 260 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 25/12/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1938 19/02/1938 8 days Light Repair
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1941 28/06/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3111 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1944 10/06/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 23/11/1946 29 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1915 To Service To service as GCR Number 339
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
13/07/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1918. Dep: 09/11/1918.    
04/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 27/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
26/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 953 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5339
   
21/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.    
30/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 27/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 260 (Diagram 14)
   
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
   
12/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Trip cock gear fitted
   
31/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3111 (Diagram 14)
   
29/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
   
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9058    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
   
16/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69058 but not taken up    
29/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9058 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev