|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/07/1918 | 09/11/1918 | 120 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1921 | 27/08/1921 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1924 | 27/09/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 953 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5339 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1933 | 27/01/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 260 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 25/12/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 8 days | Light Repair | Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3111 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 29 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 339 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1918. Dep: 09/11/1918. | ||
04/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 27/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
26/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 953 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5339 |
||
21/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. | ||
30/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 27/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 260 (Diagram 14) |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
12/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. Work undertaken: Trip cock gear fitted |
||
31/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3111 (Diagram 14) |
||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9058 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14) |
||
16/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69058 but not taken up | ||
29/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9058 from Frodingham (FRO) |