Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 340 m/e 12/1915
LNER (1924) 5340   27/06/1925
LNER (1946) 9059   29/06/1946
BR 69059   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L312/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1915 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Mon 29/08/1949 off Neasden (NEA)
Service Life 33 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 12/1915
ANN Annesley 10/03/1923
MEX Mexborough 18/02/1929
NEA Neasden 15/08/1933
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/12/1937
NEA Neasden 15/01/1938
WFD Woodford Halse 02/02/1941
NEA Neasden 27/09/1941
MEX Mexborough 28/10/1947
NEA Neasden 11/04/1948
   Withdrawn 29/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 17/04/1948
WDN NEA Neasden 29/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 997)
27/06/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1674)
11/08/1928 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 339)
24/09/1932 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1574)
13/03/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 649)
02/11/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3103)
29/06/1946 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 649)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1917 11/08/1917 36 days General  
Gorton Works 17/07/1920 28/08/1920 43 days General  
Gorton Works 30/12/1922 24/02/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 25/04/1925 27/06/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5340
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 11/08/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 15/02/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 24/09/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 03/12/1932 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 13/03/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1940 23/03/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 02/11/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1943 16/10/1943 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 29/06/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9059
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1947 25/10/1947 8 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1915 To Service To service as GCR Number 340
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
07/07/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 11/08/1917.    
17/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1920. Dep: 28/08/1920.    
30/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923.    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5340
   
30/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
   
18/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930.    
20/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14)
   
29/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.    
15/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
   
16/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
15/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940.    
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
   
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
04/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943.    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9059
   
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.    
28/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69059 but not taken up    
29/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9059 from Neasden (NEA)    

prev prev