|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1917 | 11/08/1917 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1920 | 28/08/1920 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1922 | 24/02/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1925 | 27/06/1925 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5340 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1928 | 11/08/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1940 | 23/03/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9059 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 340 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 11/08/1917. | ||
17/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1920. Dep: 28/08/1920. | ||
30/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923. | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5340 |
||
30/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14) |
||
18/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. | ||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14) |
||
29/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. | ||
15/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) |
||
16/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
16/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940. | ||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14) |
||
02/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9059 |
||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. | ||
28/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69059 but not taken up | ||
29/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9059 from Neasden (NEA) |