Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 151 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6540 Week
» 26982 Month
» 363828 Year
» 1585393 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 342 m/e 06/1916
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5342   28/03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9061   09/11/1946
British Railways 69061   06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L306/1916
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1916 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 09/02/1953 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/2/53

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) m/e 06/1916
WFD Woodford Halse on 09/08/1925
MAR March on 11/05/1929
WFD Woodford Halse on 08/03/1931
NEA Neasden on 17/03/1931
WFD Woodford Halse on 02/02/1941
NEA Neasden on 27/09/1941
   Withdrawn on 09/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 09/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1916 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1575)
28/03/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1673)
14/02/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1812)
20/01/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 331)
14/05/1938 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 724)
21/03/1942 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 590)
23/09/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
06/12/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 648)
15/04/1950 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3115)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/06/1919 16/08/1919 64 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1921 24/09/1921 85 days General  
Gorton Works 15/04/1922 03/06/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 24/01/1925 28/03/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5342
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1929 09/03/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 14/02/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1812 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 20/01/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 331 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1938 14/05/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 724 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1942 21/03/1942 34 days General
Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1944 23/09/1944 33 days General
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 06/12/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1948 1 day Light Repair
Firebox fracture
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1950 15/04/1950 36 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1916 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 342
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
14/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1919. Dep: 16/08/1919.    
02/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1921. Dep: 24/09/1921.    
15/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1922. Dep: 03/06/1922.    
24/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5342
   
09/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
26/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 09/03/1929.    
11/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1812 (Diagram 14)
   
08/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
17/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
30/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 331 (Diagram 14)
   
09/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 724 (Diagram 14)
   
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14)
   
22/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
09/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9061    
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
   
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69061    
06/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Firebox fracture
   
11/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 14)
   
09/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69061 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev