Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 343 m/e 06/1916
LNER (1924) 5343   07/02/1925
LNER (1946) 9062   13/10/1946
BR 69062   19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L306/1916
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1916 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 14/05/1951 off Northwich (9G)
Service Life 34 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 26/5/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 06/1916
ANN Annesley 12/03/1920
MEX Mexborough 09/02/1929
WFD Woodford Halse 04/08/1942
13D Northwich 22/01/1943
GOR Gorton 02/02/1947
13D Northwich 02/04/1947
   Withdrawn 14/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton 02/02/1947
ALLOC NTH Northwich 02/04/1947
WDN   14/05/1951
WDN   w/e 19/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1916 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1576)
07/02/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 339)
12/06/1926 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1675)
18/07/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 492)
09/04/1938 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 340)
16/08/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 707)
08/01/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 614)
08/09/1945 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3101)
29/03/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3127)
15/10/1949 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3124)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1917 21/04/1917 36 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1919 17/01/1920 78 days General  
Gorton Works 15/07/1922 26/08/1922 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 07/02/1925 50 days General
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5343
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1925 28/11/1925 36 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 20/03/1926 12/06/1926 85 days General
Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1928 19/01/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 20/06/1931 18/07/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1933 10/02/1934 50 days Heavy
Re-tubing
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1938 09/04/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1941 16/08/1941 40 days General
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1943 08/01/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 08/09/1945 36 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3101 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 29/03/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1948 19/06/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 69062
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1949 15/10/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1916 To Service To service as GCR Number 343
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
17/03/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1917. Dep: 21/04/1917.    
01/11/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1919. Dep: 17/01/1920.    
12/03/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922.    
20/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5343
   
24/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/10/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925.    
20/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1926. Dep: 12/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
   
24/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.    
09/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14)
   
23/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Re-tubing
   
12/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 14)
   
08/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
   
04/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
22/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
03/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 3101 (Diagram 14)
   
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9062    
02/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3127 (Diagram 14)
   
02/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
05/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69062
   
17/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 14)
   
14/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69062 from Northwich (9G)    

prev prev