Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1086 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7475 Week
» 27917 Month
» 364763 Year
» 1586328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 344 m/e 08/1916
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5344   11/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9063   11/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L308/1916
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1916 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 25/07/1947 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 08/1916
WFD Woodford Halse on 08/11/1919
MAR March on 11/05/1929
GOR Gorton on 01/08/1931
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 18/10/1932
MEX Mexborough on 27/12/1933
DON Doncaster on 10/02/1934
NEA Neasden on 29/12/1935
WFD Woodford Halse on 02/02/1941
NEA Neasden on 27/09/1941
WFD Woodford Halse on 04/08/1942
NEA Neasden on 31/01/1943
WFD Woodford Halse on 15/02/1943
MEX Mexborough on 21/06/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 10/09/1946
   Withdrawn on 25/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 25/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1916 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1577)
22/04/1922 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1559)
16/02/1929 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1674)
04/07/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 60)
03/10/1936 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 657)
25/10/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3105)
20/05/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 611)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1919 07/06/1919 92 days General  
Gorton Works 28/01/1922 22/04/1922 85 days General
Boiler number 1559 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 11/07/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5344
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1928 16/02/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1931 04/07/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 03/10/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1941 25/10/1941 53 days General
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1944 20/05/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1946 09/02/1946 23 days Light Repair
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1916 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 344
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
08/03/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1919. Dep: 07/06/1919.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 22/04/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1559 (Diagram 14)
   
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5344
   
29/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
   
11/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
30/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
   
01/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
27/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
   
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
   
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
04/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
31/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
15/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14)
   
18/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9063    
10/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
25/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 9063 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev