Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 117 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7858 Week
» 28300 Month
» 365146 Year
» 1586711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 345 m/e 01/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5345   28/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9064   12/10/1946
British Railways 69064   12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L301/1917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 01/1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 24/01/1955 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 38 yrs , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 29/1/55

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 01/1917
ANN Annesley on 07/01/1920
MEX Mexborough on 23/02/1929
MEX Mexborough on 12/03/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/11/1942
MEX Mexborough on 20/02/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 12/10/1946
NEA Neasden on 20/10/1946
NWE New England on 09/03/1947
34E Neasden on 10/12/1950
34A Kings Cross on 31/05/1953
36C Frodingham on 21/06/1953
   Withdrawn on 24/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34E Neasden m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   w/e 24/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1578)
28/11/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1814)
09/03/1929 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1578)
03/10/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1674)
15/09/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 648)
31/07/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 605)
30/11/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 649)
19/02/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 670)
12/10/1946 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3103)
12/08/1950 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 659)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/09/1919 22/11/1919 78 days General  
Gorton Works 18/02/1922 15/04/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/09/1925 28/11/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1814 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5345
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 09/03/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1578 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1931 03/10/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1934 15/09/1934 36 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 31/07/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1940 30/11/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1944 19/02/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1944 04/11/1944 26 days Light Repair
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1946 12/10/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9064
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1950 12/08/1950 50 days General
Boiler number 659 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69064
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1950 21/10/1950 1 day C/L  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 345
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
06/09/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1919. Dep: 22/11/1919.    
07/01/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 15/04/1922.    
26/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1814 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5345
   
02/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 09/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1578 (Diagram 14)
   
23/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14)
   
11/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
14/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
   
20/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3103 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9064
   
12/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 659 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69064
   
21/10/1950 Works Visit      
10/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
31/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
24/01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69064 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev