Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 574 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3717 Week
» 13887 Month
» 291683 Year
» 1176064 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 366 m/e 02/1917
LNER (1924) 5366   03/04/1926
LNER (1946) 9065   11/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E9065   31/01/1948
BR 69065   12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L302/1917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1917 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Mon 10/05/1954 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 15/5/54

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 02/1917
ANN Annesley 02/02/1923
MEX Mexborough 23/02/1929
NEA Neasden 25/08/1946
MEX Mexborough 22/04/1947
NEA Neasden 11/04/1948
34A Kings Cross 31/05/1953
36C Frodingham 21/06/1953
   Withdrawn 10/05/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 22/04/1947
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   w/e 10/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1671)
14/08/1920 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1909)
08/12/1928 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1556)
28/04/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1672)
17/04/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 977)
21/09/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 611)
29/01/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 648)
04/01/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 687)
12/08/1950 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 683)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/03/1920 14/08/1920 148 days General
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1922 16/12/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 30/01/1926 03/04/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5366
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 08/12/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 09/05/1931 57 days General  
Gorton Works 24/03/1934 28/04/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 17/04/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1937 11/12/1937 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 21/09/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1941 21/02/1942 61 days Light Repair
R.H. frame patched
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1943 29/01/1944 44 days General
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1945 04/08/1945 15 days Light Repair
R.H. cylinder welded
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1945 01/12/1945 15 days Light Repair
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 04/01/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 31/01/1948 15 days Light Repair
After collision
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9065
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1950 12/08/1950 43 days General
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69065
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1917 To Service To service as GCR Number 366
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
20/03/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
   
28/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 16/12/1922.    
02/02/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5366
   
27/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14)
   
23/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.    
24/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
   
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
   
20/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.    
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14)
   
23/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1941. Dep: 21/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
R.H. frame patched
   
17/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
   
21/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
R.H. cylinder welded
   
17/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9065    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14)
   
22/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9065
   
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69065
   
31/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
10/05/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69065 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev