|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/03/1920 | 14/08/1920 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1922 | 16/12/1922 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5366 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1928 | 08/12/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1931 | 09/05/1931 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1940 | 21/09/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1941 | 21/02/1942 | 61 days | Light Repair | R.H. frame patched |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | R.H. cylinder welded |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1948 | 31/01/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9065 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1950 | 12/08/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69065 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 366 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
28/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 16/12/1922. | ||
02/02/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5366 |
||
27/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14) |
||
23/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. | ||
24/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14) |
||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) |
||
20/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. | ||
17/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14) |
||
23/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1941. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: R.H. frame patched |
||
17/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
21/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: R.H. cylinder welded |
||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9065 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
22/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9065 |
||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
01/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69065 |
||
31/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
10/05/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69065 from Frodingham (36C) |