|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/10/1919 | 20/12/1919 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1923 | 12/05/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1926 | 09/10/1926 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5367 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1928 | 31/03/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 13/06/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1937 | 30/10/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1943 | 05/02/1944 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 367 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
18/10/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 20/12/1919. | ||
20/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923. | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5367 |
||
04/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928. | ||
24/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14) |
||
21/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. | ||
03/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. | ||
02/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14) |
||
29/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14) |
||
07/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
24/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9066 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
14/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14) |
||
11/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
22/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69066 but not taken up | ||
17/04/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9066 from Frodingham (36C) |