|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1919 | 21/06/1919 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1921 | 08/04/1922 | 127 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1924 | 27/09/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5368 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1936 | 06/02/1937 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 678 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 31/12/1937 | 35 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1941 | 18/01/1941 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1943 | 13/03/1943 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | Main frame damaged |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 368 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1919. Dep: 21/06/1919. | ||
08/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 08/04/1922. | ||
02/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5368 |
||
01/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
25/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
29/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. | ||
24/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14) |
||
03/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
27/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
27/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 06/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 678 (Diagram 14) |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14) |
||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. | ||
13/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. Work undertaken: Main frame damaged |
||
21/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9067 | ||
29/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69067 but not taken up | ||
19/02/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9067 from Neasden (34E) |