Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1086 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7475 Week
» 27917 Month
» 364763 Year
» 1586328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 369 m/e 04/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5369   03/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9068   25/08/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E9068   14/02/1948
British Railways 69068   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L304/1917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 04/1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1950 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys
Information Carried an E prefix prior to BR renumbering

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/6/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 04/1917
WFD Woodford Halse on 16/05/1920
NEA Neasden on 30/01/1925
WFD Woodford Halse on 25/03/1929
NEA Neasden on 29/06/1929
IMM Immingham on 05/11/1929
FRO Frodingham on 20/09/1932
NEA Neasden on 04/10/1941
   Withdrawn on 05/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 34E Neasden on 05/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1674)
03/01/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1574)
30/01/1932 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 988)
06/04/1935 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 707)
28/06/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
01/07/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3105)
14/02/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 342)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/01/1920 13/03/1920 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/12/1921 08/04/1922 120 days General  
Gorton Works 08/11/1924 03/01/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5369
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1929 05/10/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 31/12/1931 30/01/1932 31 days General
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1935 06/04/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 08/10/1938 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/05/1941 28/06/1941 36 days General
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1944 01/07/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1944 23/09/1944 19 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 14/02/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9068
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 369
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
31/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1920. Dep: 13/03/1920.    
16/05/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1921. Dep: 08/04/1922.    
08/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 03/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1574 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5369
   
30/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
24/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929.    
05/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 30/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14)
   
20/09/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938.    
24/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
04/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14)
   
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9068    
17/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9068
   
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69068 but not taken up    
05/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9068 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev