|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
25/05/1908 | 18/07/1908 | 55 days | General | ||||
08/11/1909 | 06/05/1910 | 180 days | General | ||||
25/10/1911 | 07/12/1911 | 44 days | General | ||||
01/08/1913 | 16/09/1913 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
29/10/1914 | 16/12/1914 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
01/07/1916 | 28/08/1916 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
28/03/1917 | 23/05/1917 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
11/12/1917 | 12/04/1918 | 123 days | General | Boiler number 445 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
08/09/1919 | 24/10/1919 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 501 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
06/09/1920 | 12/10/1920 | 37 days | General | ||||
20/08/1921 | 28/09/1921 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 254 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
19/03/1923 | 18/05/1923 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1733 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
02/07/1924 | 26/08/1924 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 236 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6150 |
|||
23/03/1926 | 05/05/1926 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 484 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1929 | 26/01/1929 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 445 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 433 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1932 | 02/07/1932 | 22 days | General | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1937 | 08/01/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1941 | 08/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 484 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1946 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway Number 31 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4248 Allocated to Tuxford (TUX) Diagram 19A boiler fitted |
||
01/1908 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1150 | ||
03/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1929. Dep: 26/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 445 (Diagram 19A) |
||
03/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 433 (Diagram 19A) |
||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
01/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
18/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
15/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
12/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 484 (Diagram 19A) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 9081 but not taken up | ||
10/08/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6150 from Tuxford (TUX) | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 10/08/1946. |