Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1563 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4563 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9443 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69443 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
261 |
Works Number |
1258 |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 11/03/1959 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1563 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1258 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4563 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9443 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69443 |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69443 |
|
|