Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 214 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2553 Week
» 8687 Month
» 236571 Year
» 1458136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1571 m/e 12/1910
LNER (1924) 4571 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 9451 m/e 03/1946
BR 69451 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1286
To Service During 12/1910
Withdrawal Wed 12/10/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1910
HSY Hornsey 01/01/1948
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 20/06/1953
34B Hornsey 4w/e 25/07/1953
38A Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 23/04/1955
   Withdrawn 12/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   12/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1571
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1286
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4571    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9451    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 69451    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
12/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69451    

prev prev