Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2715 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16121 Week
» 69137 Month
» 188664 Year
» 3215517 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1575 |
m/e |
12/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4575 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9455 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69455 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
264 |
Works Number |
1290 |
To Service |
During 12/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 16/05/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1575 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1290 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4575 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9455 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69455 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
16/05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69455 |
|
|