Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 205 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 205 Week
» 14462 Month
» 242346 Year
» 1463911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1589 m/e 03/1912
LNER (1924) 4589 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 9469 m/e 09/1946
BR 69469 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1334
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Mon 15/04/1957
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1912
KX Kings Cross 01/01/1948
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/02/1954
38D Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 24/04/1954
38A Colwick 4w/e 13/11/1954
37A Ardsley 3w/e 12/11/1955
56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 15/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   15/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Cowlairs Works The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. SLS/194702
19/06/1948 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1589
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1334
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4589    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9469    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69469    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
15/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69469    

prev prev