Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1992 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15398 Week
» 68414 Month
» 187941 Year
» 3214794 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1595 |
m/e |
05/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4595 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9475 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69475 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
267 |
Works Number |
1340 |
To Service |
During 05/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/04/1955 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1595 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1340 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4595 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9475 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69475 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
11/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69475 |
|
|