Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1612 |
m/e |
08/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4612 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9496 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69496 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
292 |
Works Number |
1527 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 08/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/04/1958 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1921 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
4w/e |
19/10/1957 |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
14/12/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1947 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1612 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1527 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4612 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9496 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69496 |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69496 |
|
|