Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 347 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3895 Week
» 4785 Month
» 312766 Year
» 1197147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1722 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 4722 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 9501 m/e 04/1946
BR 69501 w/e 09/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class N2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L734
Works Number 22578
Condensors (when built) Fitted
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Wed 20/11/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34C Hatfield 4w/e 19/05/1951
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 24/10/1953
34B Hornsey 4w/e 20/02/1954
   Withdrawn 20/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1927 Condensers removed
02/1928 Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
02/1940 Vacuum Brake
12/1950 Robinson pattern superheater fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1722
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22578
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4722    
08/1927 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
02/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake    
02/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brake    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9501    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
12/1950 Modification Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69501    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69501    

prev prev